|
01/27/2010
|
To inactive file by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From Conference Committee: proposed conference committee report be adopted. Assembly (Ayes 4 (Bass, Huffman, Caballero, Solorio) Noes 0). Senate (Ayes 4 (Steinberg, Florez, Padilla, Pavley) Noes 0). To print.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Assembly appoints conference committee: Assembly Members Bass, Caballero, Fuller, Huffman, Jeffries, Nielsen, and Solorio. Senate appoints conference committee: Senators Steinberg, Aanestad, Cogdill, Florez, Huff, Padilla, and Pavley.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Joint Rules 28, 28.1, 29, and 29.5 suspended in the Assembly. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 2827.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29.5 suspended in the Senate. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 2005.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 66. Page 2538.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1701.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 2021.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|