02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/13/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/31/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2009 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. | |||
02/24/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |||
02/23/2009 | Read first time. To print. |