|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6601.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4772.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 3907.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (January 13).
|
|
|
|
01/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|