|
09/08/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Page 1907.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1838.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|