California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 31, 2009
Bill August 24, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 13, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009