|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1428.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1237.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|