LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB41
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB41
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB41
Compare Versions
AB41 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB41 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB41 Amended August 17, 2010
AB41 Amended June 22, 2010
AB41 Amended May 27, 2010
AB41 Amended January 25, 2010
AB41 Amended January 7, 2010
AB41 Amended January 4, 2010
AB41 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB41 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB41 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB41 Amended August 17, 2010
AB41 Amended June 22, 2010
AB41 Amended May 27, 2010
AB41 Amended January 25, 2010
AB41 Amended January 7, 2010
AB41 Amended January 4, 2010
AB41 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare