|
10/26/2009
|
(Corrected October 26.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 1840.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|