|
09/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2256.) From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2222.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1951.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|