California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB420 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/21/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 420AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas FEBRUARY 23, 2009 An act to add and repeal Article 1.6 (commencing with Section 123259) of Part 2 of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to maternal health, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 420, as amended, Salas. Maternal health. Under existing law, the maternal and child health program includes provisions for pregnancy testing, perinatal health care, child health, and nutrition. This bill would require the State Department of Public Health to conduct the Perinatal Mood and Anxiety Disorders (PMAD) Community Awareness Campaign to  identify barriers to accessing PMAD treatment and  increase awareness and provide education to pregnant women and new mothers on postpartum mood and anxiety disorders. The bill would require the department to convene a workgroup, which would be required, by January 1,  2010   2011  , to prepare and submit to the department specified recommendations relating to the implementation of the awareness campaign. It would prohibit public sources of funds from being used to fund the campaign. The bill would authorize the department to use nonpublic sources of funding to support the activities of the workgroup and fund the campaign. The bill would require that voluntary funds received for the purposes of this bill be deposited into the  Community Postpartum Anxiety and Mood Disorders   PMAD Community  Awareness Campaign Fund, which the bill would create, and would continuously appropriate the moneys in the fund to the department to implement the awareness campaign. The bill would further provide that if the Department of Finance determines that  ,   on January 1, 2011,  insufficient voluntary contributions for purposes of implementing these provisions have been deposited with the state  by January 1, 2010,  the Department of Finance shall notify either the Chief Clerk of the Assembly or the Secretary of the Senate of this fact, in which case these provisions would be repealed on  January 1, 2010   the date of that notification  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Article 1.6 (commencing with Section 123259) is added to Part 2 of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, to read: Article 1.6. Perinatal Mood and Anxiety Disorders Community Awareness Campaign 123259. The department shall conduct the Perinatal Mood and Anxiety Disorders (PMAD) Community Awareness Campaign to do all of the following: (a) Provide awareness, assistance, and information regarding PMAD using television, print media, radio, Internet Web sites, outdoor advertising, and other media, where appropriate, to disseminate information to pregnant women and new mothers regarding the availability of services and treatment for PMAD, which may include medication, professional therapy and counseling, support groups, and telephone crisis hotlines. (b) Establish an Internet Web site devoted to providing information about the symptoms and treatment of PMAD that is accessible to the general public. (c) Undertake public education activities related to PMAD, as appropriate. 123259.1. (a) The department shall convene a workgroup to  identify barriers to accessing Perinatal Mood and Anxiety Disorder (PMAD) treatment and  develop recommendations on the most efficient and effective ways to raise public awareness of the symptoms, warning signs, and treatment of  Perinatal Mood and Anxiety Disorders (PMAD)   PMAD  . The workgroup shall also be responsible for securing private contributions to fund the campaign. The workgroup may include a survivor of PMAD, and members from all of the following:  (1) The California Medical Association.   (2) The American College of Obstetrics and Gynecology.   (3) The California Psychiatric Association.   (4) Postpartum Support International.   (5) The California Hospital Association.   (6) The California Psychological Association.   (7) The California Nurses Association.   (8) The California Association for Nurse Practitioners.   (9) The California Nurse Midwives Association.   (1) The American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, District IX, to be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly.   (2) The California Association for Nurse Practitioners, to be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly.   (3) The California Hospital Association, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules.   (4) The California Medical Association, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules.   (5) The California Nurse Midwives Association, to be appointed by the Governor.   (6) The California Nurses Association, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules.   (7) The California Psychiatric Association, to be appointed by the Governor.   (8) The California Psychological Association, to be appointed by the Governor.   (9) Postpartum Support International, to be appointed by the Governor.   (10) The State Department of Mental Health.   (11) The State Department of Public Health.   (12) The Union of American Physicians and Dentists, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules.   (13) The Union Nurses Associations of California/Union of Health Care Professionals, to be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly.  (b) By January 1,  2010   2011  , the workgroup shall prepare and submit to the department its recommendations relating to the PMAD campaign. (c) The department may use only nonpublic sources of funding to support the activities of the workgroup and to fund the campaign. Voluntary contributions received for the purposes of this article shall be deposited into the  Community Postpartum Anxiety and Mood Disorders   PMAD Community  Awareness Campaign Fund, which is hereby created in the State Treasury. No state or federal funds may be deposited into the campaign fund. Notwithstanding Section 13340 of the Government Code, moneys in the fund are hereby continuously appropriated to the department to implement this article. Notwithstanding Section 16305.7 of the Government Code, any interest earned on moneys in the fund shall be deposited in the fund. 123259.2. (a) This article shall be implemented only after the Department of Finance determines that nonstate funds in an amount sufficient to fully support the activities of this article have been deposited with the state. Thereafter, this article shall continue to be implemented only to the extent that the Department of Finance determines that sufficient nonstate funds to fully support the activities of this article have been deposited with the state for purposes of this article. (b) If the Department of Finance determines  that   that, on January 1, 2011,  insufficient voluntary contributions for purposes of implementing this article have been deposited with the state  by January 1, 2010  , the Department of Finance shall notify either the Chief Clerk of the Assembly or the Secretary of the Senate of this fact, in which case,  upon the making of their notification, this article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2010, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2010, deletes or extends that date.   this article shall be repealed on the date that notification is made.