LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB424
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB424
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB424
Compare Versions
AB424 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB424 Amended June 22, 2010
AB424 Amended January 13, 2010
AB424 Amended January 7, 2010
AB424 Amended January 4, 2010
AB424 Amended April 22, 2009
AB424 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB424 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB424 Amended June 22, 2010
AB424 Amended January 13, 2010
AB424 Amended January 7, 2010
AB424 Amended January 4, 2010
AB424 Amended April 22, 2009
AB424 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare