LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB429
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB429
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB429
Compare Versions
AB429 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB429 Amended September 4, 2009
AB429 Amended September 1, 2009
AB429 Amended July 24, 2009
AB429 Amended April 29, 2009
AB429 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB429 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB429 Amended September 4, 2009
AB429 Amended September 1, 2009
AB429 Amended July 24, 2009
AB429 Amended April 29, 2009
AB429 Introduced February 23, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare