02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/13/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 15). | |||
04/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES. | |||
02/25/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Read first time. To print. |