BILL NUMBER: AB 434CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 229 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Block FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to amend Section 8483.9 of the Education Code, relating to after school programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 434, Block. After school programs. Existing law establishes the After School Education and Safety Program to serve pupils in kindergarten and grades 1 to 9, inclusive, at participating public elementary, middle, junior high, and charter schools. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to apportion moneys, from those continuously appropriated for purposes of after school programs, to program applicants in the form of grants according to a specified priority scheme and specifies maximum grant amounts for 3-year direct grants for before and after school programs. Existing law limits the amount of state funds a program participant may expend on administrative costs to 15% of the participant's funding. Existing law requires a program participant receiving state funding to ensure that no less than 85% of that funding is allocated to schoolsites for direct services to pupils. This bill would authorize the cost of a program site supervisor to be included as direct services, provided that at least 85% of the site supervisor's time is spent at the program site. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8483.9 of the Education Code, as amended by Section 6 of Chapter 553 of the Statutes of 2005, is amended to read: 8483.9. (a) A program participant receiving funding pursuant to this article may expend on indirect costs no more than the lesser of the following: (1) The school district's indirect cost rate, as approved by the department for the appropriate fiscal year. (2) Five percent of the state program funding received pursuant to this article. (b) A program participant receiving state funding pursuant to this article may expend no more than 15 percent of that funding on administrative costs, which funding need not be earned through pupil attendance. For purposes of this section, administrative costs shall include indirect costs, as described in subdivision (a). (c) A program participant receiving state funding pursuant to this program shall ensure that no less than 85 percent of that funding is allocated to schoolsites for direct services to pupils. The cost of a program site supervisor selected pursuant to Section 8483.4 may be included as direct services, provided that at least 85 percent of the site supervisor's time is spent at the program site.