|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 3292.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 2339.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 1764.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|