|
05/06/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 1622.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|