LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB44
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB44
Compare Versions
AB44 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB44 Enrolled September 10, 2010
AB44 Amended August 19, 2010
AB44 Amended August 2, 2010
AB44 Amended June 3, 2010
AB44 Amended June 1, 2009
AB44 Amended March 31, 2009
AB44 Amended March 18, 2009
AB44 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB44 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB44 Enrolled September 10, 2010
AB44 Amended August 19, 2010
AB44 Amended August 2, 2010
AB44 Amended June 3, 2010
AB44 Amended June 1, 2009
AB44 Amended March 31, 2009
AB44 Amended March 18, 2009
AB44 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare