|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|