|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2471.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1664.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 975.)
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|