California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB458 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 01/14/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 458AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 14, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cook  (   Coauthor:   Assembly Member   Torrico   )  FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to add Section 26708.7 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 458, as amended, Cook. Vehicles: peace officer vehicles: window tinting or glazing. Existing law prohibits a person from driving a motor vehicle with any object or material placed, displayed, installed, affixed, or applied upon the windshield or side or rear windows, with limited exceptions, including for window tinting or glazing that meets specified requirements. Federal law establishes motor vehicle safety standards for glazing material for use in motor vehicles and motor vehicle equipment. This bill would exempt a vehicle operated  by a peace officer  and owned or leased by  the peace officer's employer   a federal, state, or local agency, department, or district, that employs peace officers, for use by those peace officers in the performance of their   duties,  from California law prohibiting or limiting materials that may be placed, displayed, installed, affixed, or applied to the windshield or side or rear windows, commonly referred to as window tinting or glazing. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 26708.7 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 26708.7. Notwithstanding any other law, a vehicle operated  by a peace officer, as defined in Section 830 of the Penal Code,  and owned or leased by the peace officer's employer   a federal, state, or local agency, department, or district, that employs peace officers, as defined by Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 830) of Title 3 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, for use by those peace officers in the performance of their duties  , is exempt from California law, and regulations adopted pursuant thereto, prohibiting or limiting material that may be placed, displayed, installed, affixed, or applied to the windshield or side or rear windows, commonly referred to as window tinting or glazing.