LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB46
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB46
Compare Versions
AB46 Chaptered June 22, 2010
AB46 Enrolled June 21, 2010
AB46 Amended June 14, 2010
AB46 Amended September 4, 2009
AB46 Amended September 1, 2009
AB46 Amended July 15, 2009
AB46 Amended June 22, 2009
AB46 Amended March 31, 2009
AB46 Amended February 19, 2009
AB46 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB46 Chaptered June 22, 2010
AB46 Enrolled June 21, 2010
AB46 Amended June 14, 2010
AB46 Amended September 4, 2009
AB46 Amended September 1, 2009
AB46 Amended July 15, 2009
AB46 Amended June 22, 2009
AB46 Amended March 31, 2009
AB46 Amended February 19, 2009
AB46 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare