LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB462
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB462
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB462
Action History
04/22/2009
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/21/2009
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
03/31/2009
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
03/12/2009
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and REV. & TAX.
02/25/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
02/24/2009
Read first time. To print.