California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB463 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 463CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 111 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 9, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 22, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Tran FEBRUARY 24, 2009 An act to amend Section 32000.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 463, Tran. Vehicles: hazardous materials. Existing law generally requires a motor carrier who directs the transportation of an explosive and a motor carrier who directs the transportation of a hazardous material, who is required to display specified placards, and a motor carrier who transports for a fee more than 500 pounds of a certain type of hazardous materials, to be licensed in accordance with the Vehicle Code, unless that code or regulations adopted pursuant to that code specifically exempt the motor carrier from the licensing requirements. Existing law prohibits the Department of the California Highway Patrol from issuing a license to transport hazardous materials to a motor carrier unless each terminal from which hazardous materials carrying vehicles are operated is in compliance with the Biennial Inspection of Terminals Program and is currently rated satisfactory. Existing law requires the department to adopt rules and regulations that provide for a temporary license to transport hazardous materials for motor carriers who, within the previous 3 years, have not been issued an unsatisfactory rating for specified inspections. This bill would provide that those provisions do not prevent the department from issuing a new or initial license to transport hazardous materials to a motor carrier that applies for a license to transport hazardous materials and that, within the previous 3 years, has been issued an unsatisfactory rating as a result of specified inspections, if the motor carrier has corrected the unsatisfactory rating before applying for the license to transport hazardous materials. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 32000.5 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 32000.5. (a) A motor carrier who directs the transportation of an explosive and a motor carrier who directs the transportation of a hazardous material, who is required to display placards pursuant to Section 27903, and a motor carrier who transports for a fee in excess of 500 pounds of hazardous materials of the type requiring placards pursuant to Section 27903, shall be licensed in accordance with this code, unless specifically exempted by this code or regulations adopted pursuant to this code. This license shall be available for examination and shall be displayed in accordance with the regulations adopted by the commissioner. (b) (1) Except as provided in Section 32001, this division shall not apply to a person hauling only hazardous waste, as defined in Section 25115 or 25117 of the Health and Safety Code, and who is registered pursuant to subdivision (a) of Section 25163 of the Health and Safety Code or who is exempt from that registration pursuant to subdivision (b) of that section. (2) A motor carrier that is transporting a hazardous waste and is required to display placards pursuant to Section 27903 shall comply with all provisions of Section 32001 except paragraph (3) of subdivision (c) of that section. (c) This division does not apply to implements of husbandry, as defined in Section 36000. (d) This division does not apply to the hauling of division 1.3 explosives classified as special fireworks or to division 1.4 explosives classified as common fireworks by the United States Department of Transportation if those fireworks are transported by a motor carrier under the authority of, and in conformance with, a license issued to the motor carrier by the State Fire Marshal pursuant to Part 2 (commencing with Section 12500) of Division 11 of the Health and Safety Code. In that case, a copy of the license shall be carried in the vehicle and presented to a peace officer upon request. (e) (1) The department shall not issue a license to transport hazardous materials to a motor carrier unless each terminal from which hazardous materials carrying vehicles are operated is in compliance with Section 34501.12 and is currently rated satisfactory. (2) The department shall adopt rules and regulations that provide for a temporary license to transport hazardous materials for a carrier who, within the previous three years, has not been issued an unsatisfactory rating as a result of an inspection conducted pursuant to Section 34501, 34501.12, or 34520. (3) It is the intent of the Legislature that a carrier's license to transport hazardous materials should not be unreasonably hindered as a result of the department's verification and issuance process. (f) This section does not prevent the department from issuing a new or initial license to transport hazardous materials to a motor carrier that applies for a license to transport hazardous materials and that, within the previous three years, has been issued an unsatisfactory rating as a result of an inspection conducted pursuant to Section 34501, 34501.12, or 34520, if the motor carrier has corrected the unsatisfactory rating before applying for the license to transport hazardous materials.