06/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1549.) | |||
05/14/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/13/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/12/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |||
04/16/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/25/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Read first time. To print. |