|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6785.) (Corrected September 9.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4708.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected September 10.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Corbett.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1766.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|