|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3197.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2163.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1532.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|