|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 32. Page 1996.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|