|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 310, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 44. Noes 17. Page 3397.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2431.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 18. Noes 17. Page 2346.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2346.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 1944.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected June 2.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|