01/07/2010 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/21/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/14/2009 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 14.) | |||
03/16/2009 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. | |||
02/25/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Read first time. To print. |