|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2742.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1926.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 23).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1441.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|