|
11/30/2010
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Pavley.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 15. Noes 24. Page 2219.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2219.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 1993.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|