07/15/2009 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
07/07/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 11. Page 1611.) | |||
05/11/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/07/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/25/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Read first time. To print. |