|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1722.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1658.).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|