06/16/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1539.) | |||
05/14/2009 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1439.). | |||
04/22/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
03/12/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/25/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Read first time. To print. |