06/29/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/29/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/18/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |||
06/15/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/15/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1296.) | |||
06/10/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/09/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 9). | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/12/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
03/12/2009 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 558.) | |||
03/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (March 3). | |||
12/02/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Read first time. To print. |