|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 400, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2657.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1842.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1725.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1666.).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|