LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB503
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB503
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB503
Compare Versions
AB503 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB503 Amended August 19, 2009
AB503 Amended June 23, 2009
AB503 Amended April 14, 2009
AB503 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB503 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB503 Amended August 19, 2009
AB503 Amended June 23, 2009
AB503 Amended April 14, 2009
AB503 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare