07/07/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/09/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 980.) | |||
04/13/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/02/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) . | |||
02/25/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2009 | Read first time. To print. |