California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 1, 2009
Bill July 23, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009