LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB517
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB517
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB517
Compare Versions
AB517 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB517 Amended August 18, 2009
AB517 Amended July 23, 2009
AB517 Amended July 2, 2009
AB517 Amended April 13, 2009
AB517 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB517 Enrolled September 9, 2009
AB517 Amended August 18, 2009
AB517 Amended July 23, 2009
AB517 Amended July 2, 2009
AB517 Amended April 13, 2009
AB517 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare