LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB519
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB519
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB519
Compare Versions
AB519 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB519 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB519 Amended August 20, 2010
AB519 Amended August 9, 2010
AB519 Amended July 23, 2009
AB519 Amended June 26, 2009
AB519 Amended June 17, 2009
AB519 Amended April 29, 2009
AB519 Amended April 14, 2009
AB519 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB519 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB519 Enrolled August 31, 2010
AB519 Amended August 20, 2010
AB519 Amended August 9, 2010
AB519 Amended July 23, 2009
AB519 Amended June 26, 2009
AB519 Amended June 17, 2009
AB519 Amended April 29, 2009
AB519 Amended April 14, 2009
AB519 Introduced February 24, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare