|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 3261.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2292.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 1985.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|