LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB530
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB530
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB530
Compare Versions
AB530 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB530 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB530 Amended August 26, 2009
AB530 Amended June 28, 2009
AB530 Amended June 9, 2009
AB530 Amended May 5, 2009
AB530 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB530 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB530 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB530 Amended August 26, 2009
AB530 Amended June 28, 2009
AB530 Amended June 9, 2009
AB530 Amended May 5, 2009
AB530 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare