LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB534
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB534
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB534
Action History
02/02/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
04/01/2009
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
03/12/2009
Referred to Com. on ED.
02/26/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
02/25/2009
Read first time. To print.