|
02/02/2010
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2010
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|