|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1666.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1468.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|