LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB556
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB556
Action History
02/01/2010
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/27/2009
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/21/2009
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/10/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/16/2009
Referred to Com. on JUD.
02/26/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
02/25/2009
Read first time. To print.