|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6215.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3893.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 4).
|
|
|
|
11/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
10/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|