LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB56
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB56
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB56
Compare Versions
AB56 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB56 Amended September 1, 2009
AB56 Amended July 8, 2009
AB56 Amended June 1, 2009
AB56 Amended April 21, 2009
AB56 Amended April 14, 2009
AB56 Introduced December 5, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB56 Enrolled September 10, 2009
AB56 Amended September 1, 2009
AB56 Amended July 8, 2009
AB56 Amended June 1, 2009
AB56 Amended April 21, 2009
AB56 Amended April 14, 2009
AB56 Introduced December 5, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare