|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 3392.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2391.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 19. Noes 19. Page 2344.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2344.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 1758.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|